Shortcut Method For Multiplication With 25 and 125 In Competitive exams

 Multiplication with 25 and 125
Multiplication with 25 and 125



Normally candidates have solved multiplications with 25, 125 in a way of a lengthy process in competitive exams. There has  a shortcut method done by easy steps. By following the shortcut method, a lengthy process problem will take a less time to complete when compared to the normal method.

How to solve multiplications with 25, 125 in competitive exams?


In view of the competitive exams, candidates solve a multiplication problem with 25, 125 in a way  of writing number side by side. Finally, outcome answer will take 2 to 3 minutes. By following shortcut methods, candidates can solve more problems in the given time period. A candidate can solve about 2 to 3 problems in just 3 minutes. A lot of time have been saved. Time saving is a preferable point in the view of the competitive exams

Don't Use Paper Work

Shortcut method of multiplications with 25!


Example:
32 x 25 = ?

25 is the 4th part of 100. So we can write 25 as (100/4).
When multiplying with 32 x 25
We can write 
32 x 100 / 4

32 x 100 / 4    (There fore 32 / 4 = 8)
= 8 x 100
= 800

32 x 25 = 800

Method-II:

We can use another method which is very easy

32 x 25 = ?

32 / 4 = ?
32 / 4 = 8

The remainder is zero (0)  when this happens we have to put double zeros (00) at the end of the result.

So in this case 800 is the answer

32 x 25 = 800

The following are the numbers have to be put in the result, when the remainder is zero and non-zero
Reminder
0 = 00
1 = 25
2 = 50
3 = 75

Practice problems with 25:

45 x 25 = ?
59 x 25 = ?
84 x 25 = ?


Shortcut method of Multiplication with 125


Example:
32 x 125 = ?

125 is the 8th part of 1000. So we can write 125 as (1000/8).

When multiplying with 32 x 125

We can write 
32x 1000 / 8 =?
32 x 1000 / 8 = 4000  (There fore 32 / 8 = 4)
 32 x 125 = 4000 is the answer

Method-II:

We can use another method which is very easy to solve multiplications with 125

32 x 125 = ?

32 / 8 =?
32 / 8 = 4
In this case, the remainder is zero (0). Candidates have to put three zeros (000) after the answer.

32 x 125 = 4000

The following are the numbers have to be put in the result, when the remainder is zero and non-zero
0 = 000
1 = 125
2 = 250
3 = 375

Practice problems with 125:


33 x125 = ?
34 x 125 = ?
35 x 125 = ?
576 x 125 = ?
832x 125 = ?
757 x 125 = ?
561 x 125 = ?

NOTE: You practice like this, you will become topper in competitive exams.

Previous
Next Post »